WA HB1543 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning parental rights and responsibilities of sexual assault perpetrators and survivors.
Title
Concerning parental rights and responsibilities of sexual assault perpetrators and survivors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | House | Chapter 234, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-09 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5321 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.