WA HB1541 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the types of medications that a public or private school employee may administer to include nasal spray.
Title
Expanding the types of medications that a public or private school employee may administer to include nasal spray.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-08 | House | Chapter 180, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2013-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2013-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |