WA HB1539 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Narrowing the business and occupation tax deduction, and sales and use tax credit and refund, for bad debts available to sellers.
Title
Narrowing the business and occupation tax deduction, and sales and use tax credit and refund, for bad debts available to sellers.
Sponsors
Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 04 | 4284 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |