WA HB1538 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an aviation and aerospace advisory committee.
Title
Establishing an aviation and aerospace advisory committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-28 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |