WA HB1538 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring prime contractors to bond the subcontractors portion of retainage upon request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring prime contractors to bond the subcontractors portion of retainage upon request.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-05-16HouseChapter 302, 2017 Laws.
2017-05-16HouseGovernor signed.
2017-04-18HouseDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-17SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-12SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-13SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-03-09SenateCLS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
2017-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 82; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-07HouseFloor amendment
2017-03-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-10HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-10HouseCB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-10HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Capital Budget

Same As/Similar To

SB5222 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback