WA HB1536 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing regional apprenticeship programs through educational service districts.
Title
Establishing regional apprenticeship programs through educational service districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |