WA HB1532 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning court filing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning court filing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-04-13SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-12SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-04-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-04-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM.
2021-04-07SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-04-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-05House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-04-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-18HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-18HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-03-18HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3618018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3618020Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1532&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1532.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1532-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1532-S.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1532-S%20AMH%20WALJ%20WAYV%20326.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1532-S%20AMS%20PADD%20S3014.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1532%20HBA%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1532%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1532-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1532-S%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1532-S%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1532-S%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1532-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1532-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124546&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28824&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124546&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1532&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124546&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=29043&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124546&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1532&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback