WA HB1529 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying requirements in order to pay for debt service obligations when toll revenues are not sufficient to cover legal obligations.
Title
Modifying requirements in order to pay for debt service obligations when toll revenues are not sufficient to cover legal obligations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 4/26/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 136, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. |
2021-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |