WA HB1526 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a pilot project to increase enrollment of underrepresented students in the running start program.
Title
Creating a pilot project to increase enrollment of underrepresented students in the running start program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2013-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-03-08 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | APPE - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-25 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-25 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2013-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |