WA HB1524 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the registration of street rod vehicles and custom vehicles.
Title
Addressing the registration of street rod vehicles and custom vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Mike Pellicciotti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-27 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1524&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1524.pdf |