WA HB1523 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the availability of quality, affordable health coverage in the individual market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the availability of quality, affordable health coverage in the individual market.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateHouse Rules "X" file.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-08SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-01SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-04-01SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2019-03-08HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-08House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-15HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-08HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5526 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback