WA HB1523 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring health plans to cover, with no cost sharing, all preventive services required to be covered under federal law as of December 31, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring health plans to cover, with no cost sharing, all preventive services required to be covered under federal law as of December 31, 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2017-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Health Care.
2017-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-01HouseFloor amendment
2017-03-01House1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2017-02-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-17HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-17HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness

Same As/Similar To

SB5602 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback