WA HB1523 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding the relinquishment of water rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding the relinquishment of water rights.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2015-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback