WA HB1516 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a department of fish and wildlife directed nonlethal program for the purpose of training dogs.
Title
Establishing a department of fish and wildlife directed nonlethal program for the purpose of training dogs.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 226, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-15 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |