WA HB1516 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the recovery of gear used in the coastal Dungeness crab fishery.
Title
Regarding the recovery of gear used in the coastal Dungeness crab fishery.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-06 | Chapter 355, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-06 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-20 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-16 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-24 | NROR - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-04 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-04 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |