WA HB1514 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 9/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 9/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing transportation demand management.
Title
Addressing transportation demand management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 9/1/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 135, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5457 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 18 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 74 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 74 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70a | 15 | 4010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 0287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 12 | 0282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 16 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 44 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 70 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |