WA HB1508 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing permissive authority for counties to assume authority over local forest fire management.
Title
Providing permissive authority for counties to assume authority over local forest fire management.
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1508&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1508.pdf |