WA HB1505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning confidential information of child victims of sexual assault.
Title
Concerning confidential information of child victims of sexual assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 300, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 90; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |