WA HB1503 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning registration and consumer protection obligations of data brokers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning registration and consumer protection obligations of data brokers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2020-03-02SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-27SenateENET - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-02-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-17HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-17House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-04HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-26HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-13HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-13HouseITED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-13HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback