WA HB1502 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the procurement and design of electric ferries by counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the procurement and design of electric ferries by counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-20SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-03-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-30SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-02SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2021-02-26HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-26HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-26House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-22HouseTR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-05HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3632New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1502&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1502.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1502-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1502-S.PL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1502%20HBA%20TR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1502%20HBR%20TR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1502-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1502-S%20SBA%20TRAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1502-S%20SBR%20TRAN%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1502-S%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1502-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1502-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124367&actionText=TR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28689&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124367&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1502&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124367&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28986&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124367&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1502&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback