WA HB1495 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that qualified dealer cash incentives paid to auto dealers are bona fide discounts for purposes of the business and occupation tax.
Title
Providing that qualified dealer cash incentives paid to auto dealers are bona fide discounts for purposes of the business and occupation tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Governor vetoed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |