WA HB1494 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning private road maintenance agreements.
Title
Concerning private road maintenance agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2017-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2017-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |