WA HB1492 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning extended benefits in the unemployment insurance system.
Title
Concerning extended benefits in the unemployment insurance system.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-02-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5425 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-16 - Effective date 4/16/2021.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 22 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 22 | 020 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |