WA HB1485 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House State Government & Tribal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing Women's Suffrage Day as a legal holiday.
Title
Recognizing Women's Suffrage Day as a legal holiday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2022-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |