WA HB1484 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the statewide first responder building mapping information system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the statewide first responder building mapping information system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-03-23SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-22SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2021-03-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-06House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Education.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-15HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-12HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-04HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a320125Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
3628a060Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
3628a070Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1484&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1484.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1484-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1484-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1484-S.SL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1484%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1484%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1484%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1484-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1484-S%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1484-S%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1484-S%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1484-S%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1484-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124321&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28638&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124321&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20Education.&mId=28618&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124321&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1484&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124321&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28874&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124321&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1484&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback