WA HB1484 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an enhanced retirement benefit for public employees' and teachers' retirement system plans 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing an enhanced retirement benefit for public employees' and teachers' retirement system plans 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB5556 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback