WA HB1484 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting an excise tax on capital gains to improve the fairness of Washington's tax system and provide funding for the education legacy trust account.
Title
Enacting an excise tax on capital gains to improve the fairness of Washington's tax system and provide funding for the education legacy trust account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5699 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1484&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1484.pdf |