WA HB1483 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-17 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-17 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning workforce development in the beverage alcohol industry.
Title
Concerning workforce development in the beverage alcohol industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] |
Rep. Emily Wicks [D] | Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] | Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-10 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-12 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |