WA HB1476 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing enrollment declines due to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing enrollment declines due to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-10HouseChapter 221, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-10HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-26HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-23HousePassed final passage; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-23HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-21SenateSenate insists on its position and asks House to concur.
2021-04-13HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2021-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-30SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-30SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-30SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-25SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-03-10SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-08HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-19HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-19HouseAPP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2021-02-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.

Subjects


Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1476&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1476.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1476-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1476-S.E.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1476-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1476-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1476-S%20AMH%20STOK%20MACK%20209.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1476-S%20AMH%20STOK%20MACK%20210.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1476-S%20AMH%20STOK%20MACK%20211.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1476-S.E%20AMS%20WM%20S2489.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1476%20HBA%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1476%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1476-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1476-S.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1476-S.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1476-S.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1476-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1476-S.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1476-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1476-S.E%20HBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124302&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28618&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124302&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1476&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124302&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28992&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124302&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1476&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124302&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1476&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback