WA HB1471 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning community preservation and development authorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning community preservation and development authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-14HouseChapter 47, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-08HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-05SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2021-04-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-24SenateHLG - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
2021-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01HouseFloor amendment
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-12HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-12HouseCED - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Community & Economic Development.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43167003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43167010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1471&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1471.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1471.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1471.SL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1471.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1471%20AMH%20SANT%20JONC%20229.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1471%20HBA%20CED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1471%20HBR%20CED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1471.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1471.E%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1471.E%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1471.E%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1471.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1471.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124287&actionText=CED%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28593&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124287&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1471&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124287&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28948&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124287&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1471&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback