WA HB1469 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning enhanced raffle procedures.
Title
Concerning enhanced raffle procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Emily Wicks [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Eric Robertson [R] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 81, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-02-23 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-12 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5410 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.