WA HB1468 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
Pending: Senate State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning voter registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateReferred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology.
2018-01-08SenateRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-03SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.
2017-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-02-14HouseSEIT - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government

Same As/Similar To

SB5334 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback