WA HB1463 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring disclosure by entities that compensate for petition signatures.
Title
Requiring disclosure by entities that compensate for petition signatures.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5375 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1463&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1463.pdf |