WA HB1460 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Closing the digital divide by establishing excise taxes on telecommunications services to fund the expansion of the universal service programs in Washington.
Title
Closing the digital divide by establishing excise taxes on telecommunications services to fund the expansion of the universal service programs in Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-17 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Subjects
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
COMPUTERS
GOVERNOR
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
MINORITIES
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SENIOR CITIZENS
SOCIAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT
TAXES - EXCISE
TELECOMMUNICATIONS
UTILITIES AND TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION
COMMUNITY AND TECHNICAL COLLEGES
COMPUTERS
GOVERNOR
LOW-INCOME PERSONS
MINORITIES
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
SCHOOLS AND SCHOOL DISTRICTS
SENIOR CITIZENS
SOCIAL AND HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT
TAXES - EXCISE
TELECOMMUNICATIONS
UTILITIES AND TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 330 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 330 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 530 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
80 | 36 | 690 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | New Code | See Bill Text |