WA HB1455 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of social security numbers by the department of labor and industries and the employment security department.
Title
Concerning the use of social security numbers by the department of labor and industries and the employment security department.
Sponsors
Rep. Gina Mosbrucker [R] | Sen. Matt Boehnke [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Robert Sutherland [R] |
Rep. Cyndy Jacobsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | House | Chapter 80, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-02-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-15 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Subjects
EMPLOYMENT SECURITY DEPARTMENT
IDENTIFICATION
LABOR AND INDUSTRIES, DEPARTMENT
UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
WORKERS' COMPENSATION
IDENTIFICATION
LABOR AND INDUSTRIES, DEPARTMENT
UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
WORKERS' COMPENSATION