WA HB1453 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning residential tenant protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning residential tenant protections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateHouse Rules "X" file.
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-08SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-08SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-04-01SenateHSA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08SenateOn motion, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2019-03-08SenateHeld at the Desk.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading.
2019-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-05House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-15HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback