WA HB1452 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective date 5/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a state medical reserve corps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a state medical reserve corps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseEffective date 5/1/2023.
2023-05-01HouseChapter 210, 2023 Laws.
2023-05-01HouseGovernor signed.
2023-04-18HouseDelivered to Governor.
2023-04-17SenatePresident signed.
2023-04-14HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-04-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2023-04-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-04-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-04-03SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2023-04-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2023-03-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2023-03-17SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2023-03-16SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2023-03-16SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2023-03-16SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM.
2023-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2023-03-03SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2023-03-01HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-03-01HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-01House2nd substitute bill substituted
2023-02-28HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-23HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM.
2023-01-27HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-01-25HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-01-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1452&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1452.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1452-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1452-S2.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Passed%20Legislature/1452-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/House/1452-S2.SL.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1452%20HBA%20HCW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1452%20HBR%20HCW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1452%20HBR%20APP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1452-S2%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBA%20HLTC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBA%20WM%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1452-S2%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1452-S2%20HBR%20PL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1452-S2%20HBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66093
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66287
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67834
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67900
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128138&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30474&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128138&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30812&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128138&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1452&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128138&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30976&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128138&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=31224&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128138&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1452&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback