WA HB1450 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning coverage for biomarker testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning coverage for biomarker testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2024-01-30HouseHCW - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2024-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2024-01-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2024-01-18HouseReferred to Health Care & Wellness.
2024-01-18HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-10HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-08HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5074 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4105New CodeSee Bill Text
4843New CodeSee Bill Text
7409New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1450&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1450.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1450-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1450-S2.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1450%20HBA%20HCW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1450%20HBR%20HCW%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66020
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67372
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1450%20HBA%20HCW%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1450%20HBR%20HCW%2024.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=71058
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128136&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30655&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128136&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=31816&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback