WA HB1448 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing procedures for responding to reports of threatened or attempted suicide.
Title
Providing procedures for responding to reports of threatened or attempted suicide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-04-01 | House | Chapter 158, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass JUDI 16 bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-01-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | House | APP - Majority; do pass JUDI 15 bill proposed by Judiciary. |
2015-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2015-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-05 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-05 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5781 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.