WA HB1443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning social equity within the cannabis industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning social equity within the cannabis industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce & Gaming (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-03HouseChapter 169, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-03HouseGovernor signed.
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15HousePassed final passage; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenateCommittee amendment
2021-03-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-03-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-24SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-24SenateLCTA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM.
2021-03-22SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM.
2021-03-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.
2021-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-02House1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-24HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce & Gaming.
2021-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-12HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-12HouseCOG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.

Same As/Similar To

SB5388 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43330540Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6950335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6950336Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1443&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1443.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1443-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1443-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1443-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1443-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1443-S%20AMH%20CORR%20H1156.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1443-S%20AMH%20SULP%20H1168.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1443-S%20AMH%20CHAM%20H1167.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1443-S.E%20AMS%20LCTA%20S2159.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1443-S.E%20AMS%20MULL%20S2334.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1443-S.E%20AMS%20SALD%20S2576.2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1443%20HBA%20COG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1443%20HBR%20COG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1443%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1443-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1443-S.E%20SBA%20LCTA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1443-S.E%20SBR%20LCTA%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1443-S.E%20SBR%20LCTA%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1443-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1443-S.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1443-S.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124218&actionText=COG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28604&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124218&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%201st%20substitute%20bill%20proposed%20by%20Commerce%20%26amp%3B%20Gaming.&mId=28691&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124218&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1443&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=124218&actionText=LCTA%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28960&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124218&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-06-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1443&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=124218&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1443&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback