WA HB1442 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Defining synthetic media in campaigns for elective office, and providing relief for candidates and campaigns.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining synthetic media in campaigns for elective office, and providing relief for candidates and campaigns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2023-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-01HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-27HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.

Same As/Similar To

SB5152 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1442&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1442.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1442-S.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1442-S%20AMH%20LOW%20OMLI%20116.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1442%20HBA%20SGOV%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1442%20HBR%20SGOV%2023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128116&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30591&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback