WA HB1442 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning names used by candidates in elections.
Title
Concerning names used by candidates in elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5509 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1442&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1442.pdf |