WA HB1441 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of local infrastructure.
Title
Concerning the financing of local infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5304 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.