WA HB1430 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Improving communication between the department of children, youth, and families and caregivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving communication between the department of children, youth, and families and caregivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-17HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-02-15HouseHSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7413New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1430&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1430.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1430-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1430%20HBA%20HSEL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1430%20HBR%20HSEL%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=66059
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67782
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128094&actionText=HSEL%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30796&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback