WA HB1430 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the duration of state upland leases for lands managed by the department of natural resources.
Title
Concerning the duration of state upland leases for lands managed by the department of natural resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 194, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2022-01-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-01-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2021-02-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2021-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-19 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2021-02-10 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |