WA HB1428 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning construction projects in state waters.
Title
Concerning construction projects in state waters.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] |
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
SB5466 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.