WA HB1426 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Technology & Economic Development.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Technology & Economic Development.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing utilities serving customers in Washington and in other states to use eligible renewable resources located within the western electricity coordinating council area to comply with chapter 19.285 RCW, the energy independence act.
Title
Allowing utilities serving customers in Washington and in other states to use eligible renewable resources located within the western electricity coordinating council area to comply with chapter 19.285 RCW, the energy independence act.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Liz Pike [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Larry Crouse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Technology & Economic Development. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5400 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1426&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1426.pdf |