WA HB1423 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning safe egress from adult family homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning safe egress from adult family homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-03-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-01HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-01HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Same As/Similar To

SB5403 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback