WA HB1423 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a single set of laws and procedures governing online learning.
Title
Providing for a single set of laws and procedures governing online learning.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] |
Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2013-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-22 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |