WA HB1419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting the governor authority to proclaim a state of emergency in the event of a substantial cybersecurity incident.
Title
Granting the governor authority to proclaim a state of emergency in the event of a substantial cybersecurity incident.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Public Safety. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-02 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1419&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1419.pdf |